Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3131 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16537 Week
» 69553 Month
» 189080 Year
» 3215933 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78016 |
m/e |
03/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78016 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
08/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
17/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (67E) |
|
|
29/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stranraer (67F) |
|
|
17/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78016 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by West of Scotland Shipbreaking: Troon |
|
|