Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 776 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6381 Week
» 17928 Month
» 417610 Year
» 494197 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 78018   03/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 03/1954 to West Auckland (51F)
Withdrawal During 11/1966
Service Life 12 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
51F West Auckland (New) 03/1954
51H Kirkby Stephen 5w/e 24/04/1954
6A Chester (MR) w/e 30/04/1960
12F Workington w/e 23/06/1962
6A Chester (MR) w/e 06/10/1962
1A Willesden w/e 25/05/1963
5E Nuneaton w/e 02/10/1965
6D Shrewsbury w/e 23/04/1966
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 51F West Auckland w/e 19/03/1954
ALLOC 51H Kirkby Stephen 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 12E Kirkby Stephen 01/02/1958
LOAN 12E Kirkby Stephen 01/02/1958
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 12F Workington 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   w/e 12/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 78018
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to West Auckland (51F)
   
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12F)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 78018    

prev prev