Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 496 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5097 Week
» 16644 Month
» 416326 Year
» 492913 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7802   01/1938

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/1938 BRADLEY MANOR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Manor
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1938
Withdrawal During 11/1965
Service Life 27 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
OSW Oswestry 4w/e 20/04/1946
MCH Machynlleth 4w/e 18/05/1946
84E Tyseley 2w/e 17/11/1962
6F Machynlleth w/e 14/09/1963
6D Shrewsbury w/e 23/01/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 6F Machynlleth 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 06/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1938 To Service To service as GWR Number 7802, name: BRADLEY MANOR
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (OSW)    
18/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (MCH)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F)    
23/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7802    

prev prev