Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 148 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 148 Week
» 14405 Month
» 242289 Year
» 1463854 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 78023 m/e 05/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 05/1954 to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/05/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 13 yrs , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
19B Sheffield Millhouses (New) m/e 05/1954
36A Doncaster w/e 06/01/1962
30A Stratford w/e 04/08/1962
31B March w/e 15/09/1962
12E Barrow in Furness w/e 08/12/1962
27B Aintree w/e 18/05/1963
16D Nottingham w/e 23/05/1964
9G Gorton w/e 06/03/1965
9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 12/06/1965
9K Bolton w/e 13/08/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 15/05/1954
LOAN 41C Sheffield Millhouses 01/02/1958
ALLOC 41C Sheffield Millhouses 23/02/1958
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 01/01/1962
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 12E Barrow in Furness 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 16D Nottingham 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 9K Bolton 5w/e 10/09/1966
WDN   w/e 06/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/05/1961 Sheffield Area Several of the 1Arge diesels (Brush and EE/RSH) allocated to Darnall (41A) are being stabled at Grimesthorpe temporarily owing to repair work at former shed. Grimesthorpe has two freight diagrams for Brush diesels, one of which works over the CLC line to Walton-on-the-Hill. 2-6-0s 46450/1 an 78023 transferred from Grimesthorpe to Millhouses are in store at rear of shed. It is understood that Grimesthorpe is not to become a Diesel Depot and will close as a Motive Power Depot this year. SLS/196106
31/12/1961 Millhouses closure Millhouses M.P.D. (41C) was closed as from 31/12/61 and its allocation of locomotives distributed as follows : 41209/45/6, 43037, 45570/6/90/4, 45602/7/27/54/6/64/83/725, 45536, 46131/47/8/51/4, 46450, 61083/93, 61820/2, 73016/65/155 all to Canklow (41D); 78022/3/4/5 to Doncaster (36A). SLS/196203
16/12/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. SLS/196401
12/08/1964 Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. SLS/196409
20/09/1964 Crewe Works (Arrival Sidings) Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. SLS/196410
10/10/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: D1631-6 Motors, D1636-43 Equip., D1644-53 bodies; D243/71/87/97, D345/77/90/9, D5706/16, D6737, D8038/44/7, 42187, 42546, 44715, 44803/57, 44934, 45038, 45307/92, 48081, 48155/205/310/34/552/617, 70033/53, 78023, 84028, 92024/98, 92100; New Erecting shop: D324/36/8/53, 26025/57, 27005. Traverser Area: D237 on test, D1630 on test, D301/5/80/2, D5714, D6787/911, E3014, 26030, 44838, 45005/191, 45455, 48002/24/46/160/435/639/719/21, 70002/22, 92233; Paint shop: D221, D1627/8, D8017; Outside paint shop: D290, D304/48, D1629, 44688/779/846, 46847, 48356, 84015/25; Works yard: D232, 44710/74/985, 45279, 46484, 46519, 48306/57/533/654/740, 70011/34, 80072, 92008/74/9. SLS/196411
15/11/1964 Crewe North MPD (Ex-Works) Ex-Works: D208, D380, D1631/2, 42546, 46491 44803, 70033, 78023; Stored: 45552/4/6, 45617/72/6, 45704, 46228/35/9/40/5/8,51/4/6, 71000. Also on shed: D1585, D1697, D1744, 5056. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 78023
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)
   
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
04/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
13/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
06/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 78023    

prev prev