Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 213 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1312 Week
» 7446 Month
» 235330 Year
» 1456895 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 78026 m/e 06/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 06/1954 to Canklow (19C)
Withdrawal Wed 24/08/1966
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 12 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
19C Canklow (New) m/e 06/1954
67C Ayr w/e 27/01/1962
67E Dumfries 4w/e 19/01/1963
67F Stranraer 5w/e 29/02/1964
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 28/11/1964
   Withdrawn 24/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 19C Canklow 05/06/1954
LOAN 41D Canklow 01/02/1958
ALLOC 41D Canklow 23/02/1958
ALLOC 67C Ayr 5w/e 03/02/1962
ALLOC 67E Dumfries 2w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 67F Stranraer 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 5w/e 12/12/1964
WDN   24/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201
14/01/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 78026
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Canklow (19C)
   
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (67E)    
29/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stranraer (67F)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
24/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 78026    

prev prev