Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 583 Today
» 1207 Yesterday
» 583 Week
» 20228 Month
» 54870 Year
» 1276435 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 78045   12/10/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 12/10/1955 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Mon 03/01/1966
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 10 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
61A Kittybrewster (New) 12/10/1955
61C Keith 4w/e 02/07/1960
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
64F Bathgate 4w/e 25/07/1964
   Withdrawn 03/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster 12/10/1955
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   03/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/10/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 78045
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 78045    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev