Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1138 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18941 Week
» 71957 Month
» 191484 Year
» 3218337 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78052 |
m/e |
11/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78052 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
22/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Helmsdale (60C) (Acted as a replacement for LMS 55053 (which was life-expired), pending the arrival of permanent replacements which came in the bizarre form of a pair of GWR pannier tanks (1646 and 1649)) |
|
|
27/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aviemore (60B) |
|
|
11/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78052 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|