Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 583 Today
» 1207 Yesterday
» 583 Week
» 20228 Month
» 54870 Year
» 1276435 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 78053 m/e 11/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 11/1955 to Motherwell (66B)
Withdrawal w/e Thu 30/07/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965 at P.W. McLellan (Bo'ness)
Service Life 8 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
66B Motherwell (New) m/e 11/1955
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 8w/e 27/10/1956
61C Keith 8w/e 22/12/1956
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
65J Stirling 4w/e 19/01/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 30/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66B Motherwell 29/11/1955
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 65J Stirling 7w/e 29/12/1962
WDN   w/e 30/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 78053
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Motherwell (66B)
   
27/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
22/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stirling (65J)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 78053    
04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by McLellans: Bo'ness    

prev prev