Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 72 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4929 Week
» 16634 Month
» 348123 Year
» 424710 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7808   03/1938

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1938 COOKHAM MANOR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Manor
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1938
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Service Life 27 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
OSW Oswestry 4w/e 20/04/1946
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 26/12/1953
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 30/01/1954
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 11/07/1959
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 08/10/1960
84E Tyseley 4w/e 28/01/1961
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 06/10/1962
82C Swindon 5w/e 24/08/1964
85B Gloucester Horton Road w/e 08/11/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC OSW Oswestry 4w/e 20/04/1946
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 5w/e 30/01/1954
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 82C Swindon 3w/e 10/08/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 02/11/1964
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1938 To Service To service as GWR Number 7808, name: COOKHAM MANOR
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (OSW)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7808    
17/09/1966 Sightings Worked a GWS special from Taplow to Birmingham Snow Hill as a Preserved Engine BackTrack Jan 2007  

prev prev