Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 769 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6374 Week
» 17921 Month
» 417603 Year
» 494190 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7820   30/11/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1950 DINMORE MANOR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Manor
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 30/11/1950 to Oswestry (89A)
Withdrawal During 11/1965
Service Life 14 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
89A Oswestry (New) 30/11/1950
89C Machynlleth w/e 06/09/1952
89A Oswestry 4w/e 01/11/1952
84K Chester West 4w/e 26/12/1953
83D Laira 4w/e 01/01/1955
83F Truro 4w/e 28/11/1959
83E St Blazey 4w/e 18/06/1960
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/10/1960
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 04/05/1963
89A Shrewsbury w/e 25/05/1963
2B Oxley w/e 31/10/1964
6D Shrewsbury w/e 02/10/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   20/11/1950
1STALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 83F Truro 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 83E St Blazey 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 2B Oxley 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 06/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 7820
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Oswestry (89A)
   
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (83F)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
31/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7820    

prev prev