Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 163 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1394 Week
» 13099 Month
» 344588 Year
» 421175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7821   30/11/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1950 DITCHEAT MANOR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Manor
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 30/11/1950 to Oswestry (89A)
Withdrawal During 11/1965
Service Life 14 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
89A Oswestry (New) 30/11/1950
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 25/11/1953
84E Tyseley 4w/e 26/12/1953
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 11/07/1959
89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 07/10/1961
89C Machynlleth w/e 09/03/1963
2B Oxley w/e 07/11/1964
6D Shrewsbury w/e 02/10/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   27/11/1950
1STALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 2B Oxley 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 06/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 7821
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Oswestry (89A)
   
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7821    

prev prev