Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 90 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3707 Week
» 15412 Month
» 346901 Year
» 423488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7827   31/12/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1950 LYDHAM MANOR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Manor
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 31/12/1950
Withdrawal During 10/1965
Service Life 14 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84K Chester West 4w/e 31/01/1951
89A Oswestry 4w/e 06/09/1958
6F Machynlleth w/e 14/12/1963
6D Shrewsbury w/e 23/01/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   22/12/1950
ALLOC 84K Chester West w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 06/09/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 6F Machynlleth 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 02/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 7827
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F)    
23/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7827    

prev prev