Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 409 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2855 Week
» 14560 Month
» 346049 Year
» 422636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7828   31/12/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1950 ODNEY MANOR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Manor
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 31/12/1950
Withdrawal During 10/1965
Service Life 14 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 30/04/1951
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/11/1952
89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 20/05/1961
89C Machynlleth w/e 09/03/1963
6D Shrewsbury w/e 23/01/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   28/12/1950
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) m/e 30/04/1951
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 02/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 7828
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
23/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7828    

prev prev