Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7829 |
on |
31/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
Manor |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
377 |
To Service |
Fri 31/12/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 31/12/1965 |
Service Life |
15 yrs |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7829 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
30/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
24/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
08/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Didcot (81E) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
31/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7829 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|