Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 218 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 218 Week
» 11765 Month
» 411447 Year
» 488034 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7903   08/04/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1949 FOREMARKE HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 08/04/1949
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Service Life 15 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/04/1949
1STALLOC PDN Old Oak Common m/e 31/08/1949
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 5w/e 02/11/1963
WDN   w/e 15/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1949 To Service To service as GWR Number 7903
Built at Swindon Works
   
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 7903    

prev prev