Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18929 Week
» 71945 Month
» 191472 Year
» 3218325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7910 |
on |
31/01/1950 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
01/1950 |
HOWN HALL |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
Modified Hall |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
368 |
To Service |
Sat 31/01/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 06/02/1965 |
Service Life |
15 yrs , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/01/1950 |
1STALLOC |
NYA |
|
m/e |
28/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
81C |
Southall |
4w/e |
20/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
81D |
Reading (W.R.) |
3w/e |
04/05/1964 |
ALLOC |
81F |
Oxford |
2w/e |
28/11/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
2w/e |
21/02/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/05/1965 |
Swindon Works ('C' Shop) |
'A' Shop: D603, D800/16/8/35/41/52/6/67, D0280, D2124/42, D3003, D3582/93, D3774, D3809/17/21/30/40, D3965, D4010, D6310/7, D7015/8/21/4/37/51, D9543-9554; Turntable area: 8405, 9425/57; Weigh shop: D854. Dump: 2818, 6412, 6969; 'C' Shop: 7910 remains of. |
SLS/196506 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/01/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7910 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
22/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
06/02/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7910 |
|
|
05/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|