Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 112 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 7296 Month
» 315277 Year
» 1199658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7917   21/04/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1950 NORTH ASTON HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 21/04/1950
Withdrawal During 08/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 15 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 31/08/1950
82D Westbury 4w/e 31/10/1950
87H Neyland 4w/e 09/03/1963
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 28/09/1963
81E Didcot 4w/e 30/11/1963
81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   21/04/1950
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   06/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 7917
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. SLS 1/1962 Link
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7917    

prev prev