Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 752 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5326 Week
» 33284 Month
» 67926 Year
» 1289491 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 7923   26/09/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1950 SPEKE HALL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class Modified Hall
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 26/09/1950
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 14 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82C Swindon 4w/e 31/10/1950
81C Southall 4w/e 04/10/1958
81A Old Oak Common 6w/e 12/10/1964
88A Cardiff East Dock 2w/e 21/02/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 05/10/1964
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 2w/e 21/02/1965
WDN   03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 7923
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
21/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 7923    

prev prev