18/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8, name: PENYGHENT Built at Derby Works Allocated to Camden (1B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Derby (17A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
14/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
07/07/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 07/07/1960. Stopped on 30/06/1960 |
|
|
03/11/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 03/11/1960. Stopped on 01/10/1960 |
|
|
05/07/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 05/07/1961. Stopped on 02/05/1961 |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
25/10/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Heavy Casual) - Dep: 25/10/1961. Stopped on 17/08/1961 |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Non Classified) - Dep: 04/11/1961. Stopped on 30/10/1961 |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Crewe Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 27/01/1962. Stopped on 27/11/1961 |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
01/02/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 01/02/1963. Stopped on 01/01/1963 |
|
|
25/03/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Dep: 25/03/1963. Stopped on 02/03/1963 |
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: SLM Exhausters
|
|
|
20/04/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44008 |
|
|
30/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44008 from Toton (TO) |
|
|