Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 313 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3775 Week
» 23508 Month
» 320522 Year
» 397109 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D800 11/08/1958

Names Carried
Name Date From
SIR BRIAN ROBERTSON 11/08/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 11/08/1958
Withdrawn 05/10/1968
Time in Service 10 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys
Total Mileage 923,870 miles
Cut Up 31/07/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82C Swindon (New) 11/08/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 04/10/1958
   Withdrawn 05/10/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/08/1958 To Service To service as D800, name: SIR BRIAN ROBERTSON
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swindon (82C)
   
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
29/09/1962 Sightings Plymouth - Paddington express - all over green livery The Early Years of London Diesels  
05/10/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D800    
31/07/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev