Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 589 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6194 Week
» 17741 Month
» 417423 Year
» 494010 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80002   17/10/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Wed 17/10/1952 to Motherwell (66B)
Withdrawal Wed 01/03/1967
Service Life 14 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
66B Motherwell (New) 17/10/1952
66A Polmadie 4w/e 29/11/1952
68D Beattock 4w/e 16/06/1962
66A Polmadie 5w/e 30/05/1964
   Withdrawn 01/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66B Motherwell w/e 17/10/1952
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 68D Beattock 4w/e 09/06/1962
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 5w/e 13/06/1964
WDN   01/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/10/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 80002
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Motherwell (66B)
   
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Beattock (68D)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80002    
23/08/1968 Sightings Eastfield depot: On the triangle (dump) - Moved from carriage heating duties to the east side of the shed RO 10/1968 Link
12/09/1968 Sightings Eastfield depot - Back on carriage heating duties RO 11/1968  

prev prev