|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/03/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 32107, 34078, 35007/26, 76059/62. Erecting Shop: D2274, D3465, E5004/6/17, 15233, 30106, 30254, 30501/6/13/20, 30667, 30863, 32300, 32662, 34062/96/7, 34108, 35016/7/20, 41318, 73019, 73117, 75066/71, 76007/65, 80018/43/81, 82015, Longmoor Military Rly. 600. Behind Boiler Shop: 15202/28, 30826. Scrap Road: 30031, 30128. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/10/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 80018 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
||
21/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
19/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) | ||
07/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (75B) | ||
14/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) | ||
15/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
17/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) | ||
16/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
22/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Feltham (70B) | ||
20/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) | ||
11/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 80018 | ||
08/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |