Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1857 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15263 Week
» 68279 Month
» 187806 Year
» 3214659 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8002 |
25/07/1957 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20002 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
25/07/1957 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/07/1957 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/07/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8002 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20002 |
|
|
19/02/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20002 |
|
|
24/09/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|