Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 481 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19392 Week
» 84346 Month
» 287010 Year
» 3313863 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80028 |
on |
11/01/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
Company History |
BR |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
Mon 11/01/1952 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/09/1966 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/01/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80028 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
06/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stranraer (67F) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
26/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80028 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|