Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1572 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14978 Week
» 67994 Month
» 187521 Year
» 3214374 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8004 |
09/08/1957 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20004 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
09/08/1957 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/08/1957 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/08/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8004 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
17/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
01/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20004 |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/10/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20004 |
|
|
27/08/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|