Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 95 Today
» 1141 Yesterday
» 3550 Week
» 14843 Month
» 279476 Year
» 1501041 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80040 on 27/06/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Wed 27/06/1952 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal Wed 06/05/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 11 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) on 27/06/1952
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 10/08/1957
73F Ashford 5w/e 31/12/1959
73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962
   Withdrawn on 06/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 28/06/1952
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 25/06/1962
WDN   on 06/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay) Paint shop-44389/529/8346, D4, D3785, D5023; Diesel Erecting Shop-10201, 11126, 12038, 13091, New Work-9 D/E Sh. D3787-95new; Diesel Finishing Shop-D2/3/5, D5025; Test House-D5024; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay-42281 I, 42512 I, 42514 G, 42517 I. 42624 G. 44267 G, 44355 I, 44539 G, 47386 I, 47413 G, 47681 G, 48274/552 I, 48600 G, 48715 G, 80091 G. Stripping-44201, 47598, 48108/218stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42337/53 I, 43982 I. 44214/472 Casual, 80040 I; Stripping-47315stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-9 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo D5026-34new etc., 5 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 D6-10new; Yard-40047, 40332/680, 42257/314/54/422, 42537 frames, 42686, 43886/935, 44122/69/87/327/77/402/560, 44807, 47309, 48177/293/672/87, 58191, 75046, 10100/800, 12000/36/55, D3786, ED4, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195910
05/09/1961 Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/06/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80040
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
06/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80040    

prev prev