Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1031 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8491 Week
» 6004 Month
» 233888 Year
» 1455453 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80043 on 24/07/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 24/07/1952 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal Mon 07/03/1966
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 13 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) 24/07/1952
73H Dover Marine 5w/e 31/12/1959
73F Ashford 6w/e 09/02/1960
73F Ashford 4w/e 05/04/1960
73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962
83G Templecombe (S&D) 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn 07/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 26/07/1952
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   3w/e 12/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1958 Derby Works (Works yard) 17th September. Paint shop- 42420 I, 80061 G, D3546/7 new, D5002 new; Test House-D8000; Diesel shop- 10203, 12089, 13056, 15004, D3548-56/8 (new work order no. D658); Erecting shop-no. 1 bay- 40038 G, 42333 I, 42526 G, 43225 I, 44564 G, 47366 G, 48008 G, 48176 I, 48212 G, 48393 I, 73093 I, 75032 G, 75033 G, 80139 I, stripping-42404, 43760, 73040 G, Erecting shop-no. 2 bay- D3557 new, 42525 G, 44100 G, 44137 I, 47666 I, 48060 I, 48461 I, 48672 G, stripping-42305, 44200, 47308, 58115; Works yard- 40005, 40047, 40680, 42508, 43815, 44602, 47309, 48378/87, 75043, 80043, 15000, D3542, D8013. SLS/195810
17/10/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) 17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. SLS/195811
05/03/1961 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: 32107, 34078, 35007/26, 76059/62. Erecting Shop: D2274, D3465, E5004/6/17, 15233, 30106, 30254, 30501/6/13/20, 30667, 30863, 32300, 32662, 34062/96/7, 34108, 35016/7/20, 41318, 73019, 73117, 75066/71, 76007/65, 80018/43/81, 82015, Longmoor Military Rly. 600. Behind Boiler Shop: 15202/28, 30826. Scrap Road: 30031, 30128. SLS/196104
20/01/1963 Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/07/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80043
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
07/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80043    

prev prev