|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derby Works | 20/12/1954 | 18/01/1955 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 19/06/1957 | 01/08/1957 | 44 days | Heavy General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/08/1961 | 30/09/1961 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/02/1964 | 18/04/1964 | 51 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/08/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D2708/70/4, 44783, 45213, 45361, 61324/46/96, 65919, 80030, 90017, 90386, 90463, 90614. Valve Shop: 73077. Stripping Shop: 65923. Weigh House: 64847. Paint Shop: 73099. Works Yard: D2434, D2726, D3393, 44485, 61178, 64932, 72009, 73005, 80045, 90753. Scrap Yard: 64710 intact, 64700 being out-up. Works Shunters: D2760, D3418. | SLS/196110 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 80045 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Bedford (15D) |
||
20/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/12/1954. Dep: 18/01/1955. | ||
29/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) | ||
06/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
19/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/06/1957. Dep: 01/08/1957. | ||
07/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
26/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1961. Dep: 30/09/1961. | ||
28/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/02/1964. Dep: 18/04/1964. | ||
27/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Beattock (66F) | ||
21/11/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
01/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 80045 | ||
08/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |