Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 348 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 4786 Month
» 312767 Year
» 1197148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80051   21/11/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Wed 21/11/1952 to Newton Heath (26A)
Withdrawal Wed 17/08/1966
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Metal Industries (Faslane)
Service Life 13 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26A Newton Heath (New) 21/11/1952
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 07/05/1960
   Withdrawn 17/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 22/11/1952
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 07/05/1960
WDN   17/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/11/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 80051
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
17/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80051    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Metal Industries: Faslane    

prev prev