Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 736 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6545 Week
» 13729 Month
» 321710 Year
» 1206091 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80052   05/12/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Tue 05/12/1952 to Newton Heath (26A)
Withdrawal Tue 07/07/1964
Scrapping During 03/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 11 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26A Newton Heath (New) 05/12/1952
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 09/04/1960
   Withdrawn 07/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath 06/12/1952
LOAN 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 15/05/1954
EXLOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 09/04/1960
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 07/05/1960
WDN   29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/12/1952 To Service To service as BR Number 80052
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
07/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80052    
03/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev