Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 316 Today
» 1044 Yesterday
» 3582 Week
» 20233 Month
» 214077 Year
» 725179 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80063   19/05/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Wed 19/05/1953 to Saltley (21A)
Withdrawal Wed 24/08/1966
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Metal Industries (Faslane)
Service Life 13 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
21A Saltley (New) 19/05/1953
14B Kentish Town 4w/e 06/11/1954
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 23/02/1957
63B Stirling 4w/e 12/03/1960
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 22/08/1964
   Withdrawn 24/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 21A Saltley w/e 23/05/1953
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 63B Stirling 4w/e 12/03/1960
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 08/08/1964
WDN   10/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/05/1953 To Service To service as BR Number 80063
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Saltley (21A)
   
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
12/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stirling (63B)    
22/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
24/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80063    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Metal Industries: Faslane    

prev prev