Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 820 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 820 Week
» 12113 Month
» 276746 Year
» 1498311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80072 on 03/11/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 03/11/1953 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Sat 24/07/1965
Service Life 11 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
33A Plaistow (New) on 03/11/1953
33B Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1954
87D Swansea East Dock on 15/07/1962
2L Leamington on 08/09/1963
6D Shrewsbury w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn on 24/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow on 03/11/1953
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 2L Leamington 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 24/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/10/1964 Crewe Works (Works yard) Erecting shop: D1631-6 Motors, D1636-43 Equip., D1644-53 bodies; D243/71/87/97, D345/77/90/9, D5706/16, D6737, D8038/44/7, 42187, 42546, 44715, 44803/57, 44934, 45038, 45307/92, 48081, 48155/205/310/34/552/617, 70033/53, 78023, 84028, 92024/98, 92100; New Erecting shop: D324/36/8/53, 26025/57, 27005. Traverser Area: D237 on test, D1630 on test, D301/5/80/2, D5714, D6787/911, E3014, 26030, 44838, 45005/191, 45455, 48002/24/46/160/435/639/719/21, 70002/22, 92233; Paint shop: D221, D1627/8, D8017; Outside paint shop: D290, D304/48, D1629, 44688/779/846, 46847, 48356, 84015/25; Works yard: D232, 44710/74/985, 45279, 46484, 46519, 48306/57/533/654/740, 70011/34, 80072, 92008/74/9. SLS/196411
15/11/1964 Crewe Works (Misc.) Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. SLS/196412
24/01/1965 Crewe South MPD (Ex or waiting works) Ex or waiting works: 42979, 44679/777, 45076/553, 48001/132/94. 70036, 80072/125, 92113/206. SLS/196503

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/11/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80072
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
24/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80072    

prev prev