Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 132 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4947 Week
» 11081 Month
» 238965 Year
» 1460530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80101 on 07/02/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sat 07/02/1955 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Sat 17/07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Birds (Morriston)
Service Life 10 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
33A Plaistow (New) 07/02/1955
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
30A Stratford w/e 23/06/1962
89A Shrewsbury w/e 21/07/1962
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 08/09/1962
89B Croes Newydd w/e 23/02/1963
89C Machynlleth w/e 09/03/1963
   Withdrawn 17/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow 07/02/1955
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 30A Stratford 2w/e 23/06/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/03/1963
WDN   w/e 17/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/02/1955 Southern Miscellany Commencing in mid-February diesel shunters commenced work in Brighton Top and Lower Goods Yards, Nos. 13092/3 being the present pair. It is understood that two diesels are now being used at Three Bridges. Nos. 13100/1 appeared at Norwood Junction on 26th February. No. 80101 was back in Brighton shops on 23rd February, and No. 80102 was nearly ready (due on 28th February). Nos. 80103/4 are due 15/3 and 30/3 and 80105 in April, completing the order. The next order is for fifteen to be numbered 80106-80130, and is believed to be the last for steam construction at Brighton. SLS/195503

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/02/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80101
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
17/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 80101    

prev prev