Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 715 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4351 Week
» 23996 Month
» 58638 Year
» 1280203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80133   28/03/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 28/03/1956 to Plaistow (33A)
Withdrawal Sun 09/07/1967
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Birds (Risca)
Service Life 11 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
33A Plaistow (New) 28/03/1956
33C Shoeburyness w/e 07/11/1959
87D Swansea East Dock w/e 21/07/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 06/04/1963
87E Landore 7w/e 22/06/1964
70B Feltham m/e 17/08/1964
70A Nine Elms w/e 20/11/1964
   Withdrawn 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 33A Plaistow 28/03/1956
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 3w/e 10/08/1964
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 17/08/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 2w/e 20/11/1964
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1956 To Service To service as BR Number 80133
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Plaistow (33A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
17/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80133    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Risca    

prev prev