Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 409 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2855 Week
» 14560 Month
» 346049 Year
» 422636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 80151   18/01/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 18/01/1957 to Brighton (75A)
Withdrawal Sun 07/05/1967
Service Life 10 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
75A Brighton (New) 18/01/1957
75B Redhill m/e 06/01/1964
70E Salisbury 4w/e 08/06/1965
70D Eastleigh 4w/e 17/10/1966
   Withdrawn 07/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75A Brighton w/e 18/01/1957
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70E Salisbury P 06/06/1965
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 17/10/1966
WDN   w/e 07/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/01/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 80151
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Brighton (75A)
   
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (70E)    
17/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
07/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80151    

prev prev