Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 301 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3763 Week
» 23496 Month
» 320510 Year
» 397097 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D802 16/12/1958

Names Carried
Name Date From
FORMIDABLE 16/12/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 16/12/1958
Withdrawn 05/10/1968
Time in Service 9 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys
Total Mileage 912,880 miles
Cut Up 30/11/1970
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 16/12/1958
   Withdrawn 05/10/1968

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/12/1958 To Service To service as D802, name: FORMIDABLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
05/10/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D802    
22/07/1969 Sightings Laira Depot visit: On Laira depot. RO 10/1969 Link
30/11/1970 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev