Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1752 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19555 Week
» 72571 Month
» 192098 Year
» 3218951 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8023 |
13/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20023 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/3 (BR)) |
20301 |
15/04/1986 |
|
TOPS (20/0 (R)) |
20023 |
04/11/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
13/11/1959 to Hornsey (34B) |
Withdrawn |
17/05/1991 |
Time in Service |
31 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
09/04/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
13/11/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
27/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/11/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8023 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20023 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
15/04/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20301 |
|
|
04/11/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20023 |
|
|
17/05/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20023 |
|
|
09/04/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|