Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2662 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16068 Week
» 69084 Month
» 188611 Year
» 3215464 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8029 |
28/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20029 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
28/12/1959 to Leith Central (64H) |
Withdrawn |
05/07/1991 |
Time in Service |
31 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys |
Cut Up |
03/09/1993 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
28/12/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/12/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8029 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Leith Central (64H) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
26/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
18/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20029 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
05/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20029 |
|
|
03/09/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|