Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1570 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14976 Week
» 67992 Month
» 187519 Year
» 3214372 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8032 |
18/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20032 |
06/09/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
18/02/1960 to Inverness (60A) |
Withdrawn |
04/1993 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
18/02/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/02/1960 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8032 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Inverness (60A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
15/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20032 |
|
|
04/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20032 |
|
|