Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2732 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16138 Week
» 69154 Month
» 188681 Year
» 3215534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8033 |
18/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20033 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
18/02/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/02/1960 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS, Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8033 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Inverness (60A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
08/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20033 |
|
|
23/11/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20033 |
|
|
01/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|