Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1081 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18884 Week
» 71900 Month
» 191427 Year
» 3218280 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8034 |
12/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20034 |
09/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
12/03/1960 to Inverness (60A) |
Withdrawn |
01/10/1990 |
Time in Service |
30 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys |
Cut Up |
05/07/1991 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
12/03/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/03/1960 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8034 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Inverness (60A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
17/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20034 |
|
|
26/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
24/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
12/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
01/10/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20034 |
|
|
05/07/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|