Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 63 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17866 Week
» 70882 Month
» 190409 Year
» 3217262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8037 |
09/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20037 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
09/10/1959 to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
Withdrawn |
21/01/1987 |
Time in Service |
27 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1988 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
09/10/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/10/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8037 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20037 |
|
|
07/08/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
10/1976 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
21/01/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20037 |
|
|
05/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|