Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3006 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16412 Week
» 69428 Month
» 188955 Year
» 3215808 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8039 |
24/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20039 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
2761/D486 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
24/10/1959 to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
Withdrawn |
23/09/1986 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys |
Cut Up |
30/06/1988 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (Leicester) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
24/10/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/10/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
13/12/1971 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8039 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2761 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
13/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/09/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20039 |
|
|
24/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
21/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
23/09/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20039 |
|
|
30/06/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|