Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4130 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17536 Week
» 70552 Month
» 190079 Year
» 3216932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8040 |
30/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20040 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
30/10/1959 to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
Withdrawn |
13/09/1991 |
Time in Service |
31 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys |
Cut Up |
03/02/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
30/10/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
30/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8040 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
10/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20040 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
20/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Wigston (WG) |
|
|
13/09/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20040 |
|
|
03/02/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|