Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1433 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19236 Week
» 72252 Month
» 191779 Year
» 3218632 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8043 |
14/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20043 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
14/11/1959 to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
Withdrawn |
27/06/1991 |
Time in Service |
31 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
Cut Up |
28/04/1995 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
14/11/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/11/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
03/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8043 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20043 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
27/06/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20043 |
|
|
28/04/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|