Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8045 |
04/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20045 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
04/12/1959 to Hornsey (34B) |
Withdrawn |
10/10/1990 |
Time in Service |
30 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
14/10/1991 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
04/12/1959 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/12/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8045 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20045 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
10/10/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20045 |
|
|
14/10/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|