Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8050 02/03/1961  
TOPS (20/0) 20128 07/11/1973  
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) 20307 11/03/1998  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2002/03/1961
20/3 (DRS)11/03/1998
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 02/03/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) on 02/03/1961
41A Tinsley on 26/04/1964
40B Immingham w/e 07/08/1965
TI Tinsley 4w/e 06/10/1973


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
02/03/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8050
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
26/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
07/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
07/11/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20128 (20/0)    
11/03/1998 Renumbered Renumbered to 20307 (20/3 (RFS))    

prev prev