Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 230 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14273 Week
» 79227 Month
» 281891 Year
» 3308744 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8058 |
08/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20058 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2964/8216 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
08/05/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
28/02/1992 |
Time in Service |
30 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys |
Cut Up |
09/08/1994 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
08/05/1961 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/05/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8058 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2964 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20058 |
|
|
28/02/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20058 |
|
|
09/08/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|