Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 905 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6510 Week
» 18057 Month
» 417739 Year
» 494326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D806 03/06/1959

Names Carried
Name Date From
CAMBRIAN 03/06/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 42
Wheels B-B
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 03/06/1959
Withdrawn 02/11/1972
Time in Service 13 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys
Total Mileage 1,281,000 miles
Cut Up 01/05/1975
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 03/06/1959
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 31/08/1967
84A Laira 10w/e 01/06/1968
83A Newton Abbot 7w/e 27/07/1968
84A Laira 4w/e 01/11/1969
83A Newton Abbot q/e 22/05/1971
84A Laira 9w/e 08/01/1972
   Withdrawn 02/11/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/06/1959 To Service To service as D806, name: CAMBRIAN
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
14/07/1959 Sightings Working the 07:30 Penzance - Manchester along the sea wall at Teignmouth - In all over green and fitted with disc headcode Green Diesel Days - Huntriss  
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
01/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
01/11/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
22/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
02/11/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D806    
01/05/1975 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev