Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1224 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14630 Week
» 67646 Month
» 187173 Year
» 3214026 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8063 |
05/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20063 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2969/8221 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
05/06/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
01/05/1991 |
Time in Service |
29 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
05/06/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8063 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2969 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20063 |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
20/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Wigston (WG) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
01/05/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20063 |
|
|